MT SB251 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit texting while driving
Title
Prohibit texting while driving
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Process | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-03-18 | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-03-18 | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed | |
2011-03-18 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2011-03-15 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2011-03-02 | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2011-03-02 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-05 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-03 | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2011-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation | |
2011-01-31 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-12-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |