MT SB336 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise medical marijuana laws to authorize PTSD for coverage
Title
Generally revise medical marijuana laws to authorize PTSD for coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - (S) Rereferred to Committee (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-12 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-12 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-12 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-12-31 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |