MT SB342 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish Montana Indian language preservation pilot program
Title
Establish Montana Indian language preservation pilot program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2013-04-13 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Education |
2013-04-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Education |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (H) Education |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-02-16 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-19 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |