MT SB376 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise local government laws to expand maturity date limitations on investments
Title
Revise local government laws to expand maturity date limitations on investments
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Lake [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-11 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Returned to Senate | |
2011-04-08 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-07 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-04-07 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-18 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-03-17 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-16 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-12 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-09 | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation | |
2011-02-21 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-19 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2011-02-16 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-02-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2011-02-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-02-10 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |