MT SB44 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raise age for compulsory school enrollment
Title
Raise age for compulsory school enrollment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Motion Failed | |
2011-01-12 | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2011-01-07 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-03 | (S) First Reading | |
2010-12-27 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources | |
2010-12-10 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2010-12-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-07 | (S) Introduced | |
2010-11-23 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-11-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-11-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-11-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2010-11-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-11-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-09-16 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2010-06-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-06-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=44&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/sb0099/SB0044_1.pdf |