MT SB55 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise nursery licensing, fees, inspections, and penalties
Title
Revise nursery licensing, fees, inspections, and penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-28 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Returned to Senate Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-21 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-21 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2017-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-19 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2017-04-19 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-30 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2017-03-07 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Agriculture |
2017-02-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2017-01-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2017-01-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2016-12-29 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation |
2016-12-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2016-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-11-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-08-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |