MT SJ24 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Summary
Joint resolution to study issue of national popular vote for president
Title
Joint resolution to study issue of national popular vote for president
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration | |
2011-04-04 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-04-02 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-01 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration | |
2011-03-25 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration | |
2011-03-24 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-03-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-03-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-03-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-03-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-03-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-03-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-03-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-03-08 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2011-01-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |