NC H1008 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-17 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-17 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Real Property Donation Tax Credit
Title
Real Property Donation Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-10-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-10-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/02/2019 |
2019-10-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-10-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-08-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-08-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Filed |