NC H1015 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Ch. SL 2012-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Ch. SL 2012-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic Development and Finance Changes
Title
Economic Development and Finance Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Ch. SL 2012-74 | |
2012-06-26 | Signed By Gov. 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Ratified | |
2012-06-21 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-21 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-19 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-13 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-13 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-12 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-12 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-11 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-11 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-07 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-30 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-05-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-30 | Rec From House | |
2012-05-29 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-24 | Placed On Cal For 5/29/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Placed On Cal For 5/24/2012 | |
2012-05-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-05-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-22 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-05-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-21 | Filed |