NC H1105 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-24 - Ch. SL 2009-333
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-24 - Ch. SL 2009-333
Summary
Amend Laws/Refrigeration Contractors.
Title
Amend Laws/Refrigeration Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-24 | Ch. SL 2009-333 | |
2009-07-24 | Signed By Gov. 7/24/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Pres. To Gov. 7/14/2009 | |
2009-07-13 | Ratified | |
2009-07-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1105 |