NC H1113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Local Option Sales Tax/School Construction
Title
Local Option Sales Tax/School Construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2020-06-22 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2020 |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/18/2020 |
2020-06-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-17 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S793 (Same As) 2020-05-19 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate