NC H1131 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Carteret Commissioner Election
Title
Carteret Commissioner Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-25 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2012-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-24 | Filed |