NC H1133 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Ch. SL 2014-115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Ch. SL 2014-115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Technical and Other Corrections
Title
Technical and Other Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 100 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - M11 Not Concur M6 Reconsider (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - M12 Suspend Rules Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A10 Hamilton Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2014-07-25 - House - A10 Hamilton M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A10 Hamilton Clincher Motion Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2014-07-25 - House - A11 Brawley, W. Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A10 Hamilton Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A9 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A8 Faircloth Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A7 Stam Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A6 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A5 Martin, G. Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A4 Jones Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A3 Hall, L. Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2014-07-25 - House - A2 Hall, L. Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2014-07-25 - House - A1 Hager Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - House - Motion 12 (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - M11 Not Concur M6 Reconsider (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - M12 Suspend Rules Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A10 Hamilton Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2014-07-25 - House - A10 Hamilton M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A10 Hamilton Clincher Motion Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2014-07-25 - House - A11 Brawley, W. Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A10 Hamilton Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A9 Meyer Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A8 Faircloth Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A7 Stam Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A6 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A5 Martin, G. Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A4 Jones Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2014-07-25 - House - A3 Hall, L. Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2014-07-25 - House - A2 Hall, L. Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2014-07-25 - House - A1 Hager Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - House - Motion 12 (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Ch. SL 2014-115 | |
2014-08-11 | Signed by Gov. 8/11/2014 | |
2014-08-02 | Pres. To Gov. 8/2/2014 | |
2014-08-02 | Ratified | |
2014-08-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-08-01 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-08-01 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2014-08-01 | House | Reconsidered Concurrence |
2014-08-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-31 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2014-07-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/31/2014 |
2014-07-30 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-07-30 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-30 | Engrossed | |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-07-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-25 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-07-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Failed A10 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Recon A10 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A11 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A10 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A9 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A8 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A7 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A6 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2014-07-25 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-07-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-21 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-20 | House | Filed |