NC H116 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Summary
Railroad Corridor Management.
Title
Railroad Corridor Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment Re-submitted 1 | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment Withdrawn 1 | |
2009-05-11 | Amendment Offerred 1 | |
2009-05-07 | Postponed To 5/11/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Serial referral to Finance stricken | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-18 | Serial referral to Judiciary II stricken, if favorable Judiciary III, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H116 |