NC H1183 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-382
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-382
Summary
Health and Other Insurance Law Changes.-AB
Title
Health and Other Insurance Law Changes.-AB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-31 | Ch. SL 2009-382 | |
2009-07-31 | Signed By Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Pres. To Gov. 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Ratified | |
2009-07-20 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-16 | Placed On Cal For 7/20/2009 | |
2009-07-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-16 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2009-06-22 | Ref To Com On Insurance | |
2009-06-22 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-17 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-06-15 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-28 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-04-28 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-27 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed On Cal For 4/27/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-16 | Re-ref Com On Insurance | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-08 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1183 |