NC H1200 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Winston-Salem/New Bern Firefighters Retire
Title
Winston-Salem/New Bern Firefighters Retire
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Ch. SL 2012-123 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-27 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging | |
2012-06-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-14 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-07 | Re-ref Com On State Personnel | |
2012-06-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-31 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2012-05-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-30 | Filed |