NC H1389 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-522
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-522
Summary
Revolving Loan Fund For Energy Improvements.
Title
Revolving Loan Fund For Energy Improvements.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. Ty Harrell [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Paul Luebke [D] |
Rep. David Martin [D] | Rep. Ray Rapp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-522 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-23 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-07-20 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-16 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-14 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-14 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1389 |