NC H1433 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-424
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-424
Summary
Clarify Volunteer Immunity/AED.
Title
Clarify Volunteer Immunity/AED.
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Bordsen [D] | Rep. Bob England [D] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Ray Rapp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | Ch. SL 2009-424 | |
2009-08-05 | Signed By Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Pres. To Gov. 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Ratified | |
2009-07-27 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-23 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2009-07-16 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-07-16 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-07-13 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-04 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1433 |