NC H16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
New Hanover County Shellfish Lease Moratorium
Title
New Hanover County Shellfish Lease Moratorium
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Rena Turner [R] |
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-09 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-03-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-01-26 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S90 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate