NC H160 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Check-Off Donation: Breast Cancer Screening
Title
Check-Off Donation: Breast Cancer Screening
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - A1 Womble\Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - A1 Womble\Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-05-31 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-15 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-19 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-19 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-05-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-02 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2011-05-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-29 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-28 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-04-21 | Placed On Cal For 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-01 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-03-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-23 | Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-02-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |