NC H1744 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modify Water Funding Priorities
Title
Modify Water Funding Priorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Ch. SL 2010-151 | |
2010-07-22 | Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-06-30 | Ref To Com On Water Resources and Infrastructure | |
2010-06-30 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-10 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2010-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2010 | |
2010-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Water Resources and Infrastructure, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1293 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources