NC H187 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Amend Town of Elon Charter/Parking Ordinances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend Town of Elon Charter/Parking Ordinances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-24SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-23HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-22HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-22HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-22HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-05-22HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-13HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-27HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S530 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback