NC H1905 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire Safe Cigarettes
Title
Fire Safe Cigarettes
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Bob England [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Paul Luebke [D] | Rep. David Martin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-20 | Ch. SL 2010-101 | |
2010-07-20 | Signed By Gov. 7/20/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1338 (Same As) 2010-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Finance