NC H192 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-10 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-10 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Compliance Court Costs
Title
Compliance Court Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - A1 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - A1 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-06-10 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-06-10 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-06-09 | House | Postponed To 06/15/2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-06-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/09/2015 |
2015-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |