NC H2066 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special Retirement Allowances
Title
Special Retirement Allowances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-124 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S Amend | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-07-08 | Ref To Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-07-08 | Rec To Concur In S Amend | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Serial Referral Stricken | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-22 | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-27 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |