NC H208 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-10 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-10 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Spay/Neuter Program Transfer/Funds
Title
Spay/Neuter Program Transfer/Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Agriculture | |
2010-05-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-18 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Agriculture | |
2009-02-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |