NC H25 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Lymphedema Awareness Day
Title
Lymphedema Awareness Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-04 | Rec From House | |
2011-03-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-02 | Placed On Cal For 3/3/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-02 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-02-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-01 | Filed |