NC H253 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Ch. Res 2019-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm James Gillen/Industrial Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirm James Gillen/Industrial Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseCh. Res 2019-7
2019-04-22 Ratified
2019-04-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Select Committee on Nominations
2019-04-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-07SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-07HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-05HousePlaced On Cal For 03/06/2019
2019-03-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-04HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-28HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback