NC H254 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Ch. Res 2019-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm Ken Goodman/Industrial Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirm Ken Goodman/Industrial Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseCh. Res 2019-8
2019-04-22 Ratified
2019-04-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-16SenateRe-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations
2019-04-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-14HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-12HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-12HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-04HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-28HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback