NC H263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Serial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Serial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
UCC: Accord & Satisfaction Modification
Title
UCC: Accord & Satisfaction Modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Serial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Added |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2017-04-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Judiciary I |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |