NC H267 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Require Safety Helmets/Under 21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require Safety Helmets/Under 21

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Health
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-02HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2019-04-02HouseSerial Referral To Health Added
2019-04-02HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-03-06HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-05HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback