NC H310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarify Insurance Prod'r Crim. Bckgrd Check

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify Insurance Prod'r Crim. Bckgrd Check

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Ch. SL 2019-85
2019-07-08 Signed by Gov. 7/8/2019
2019-06-28 Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2019
2019-06-27 Ratified
2019-06-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-13SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2019
2019-04-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-21HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-03-21HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-11HouseRef to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S365 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback