NC H312 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Ch. SL 2021-107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Ch. SL 2021-107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Qualifications for Sheriff/Expunction
Title
Qualifications for Sheriff/Expunction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-04 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Ch. SL 2021-107 | |
2021-08-16 | Signed by Gov. 8/16/2021 | |
2021-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2021 | |
2021-08-05 | Ratified | |
2021-08-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-04 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-08-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/04/2021 |
2021-07-26 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-07-26 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-05 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-17 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S306 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Chaptered
Commissions
Counties
Criminal Records
Employment
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Local Government
Personnel
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Records
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Commissions
Counties
Criminal Records
Employment
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Local Government
Personnel
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Records
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143B | 974 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
15A | 145.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 145.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 145.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 151 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 153 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
162 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
162 | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
162 | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
162 | 5.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
163 | 106 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17E | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 21 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 25 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | 7 | (n/a) | Citation Text |