NC H318 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Treasurer's Investments.-AB
Title
State Treasurer's Investments.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-211 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-11 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-05-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-11 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-05 | Postponed To 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/5/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-14 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-03-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |