NC H327 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various Administrative Law Changes
Title
Various Administrative Law Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2022 |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Admin. Hearings Office
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Codifier Of Rules
Commissions
General Assembly
Judges
Media
Public
Publishing
Register
Rules Review Comn.
Title Change
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Codifier Of Rules
Commissions
General Assembly
Judges
Media
Public
Publishing
Register
Rules Review Comn.
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
150B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
150B | 21.18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.25 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 754 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
93B | 8.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |