NC H347 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Summary
Southport Annexation Agreement.
Title
Southport Annexation Agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-06-17 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-11 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-03-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-02 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S315 (Same As) 2011-08-04 - Ch. SL 2011-408
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H347 |