NC H374 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Ch. SL 2018-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Ch. SL 2018-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulatory Reform Act of 2018
Title
Regulatory Reform Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia McElraft [R] | Rep. Julia Howard [R] | Rep. Linda Johnson [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] |
Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Rena Turner [R] | Rep. Linda Hunt Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - House - Veto Override (Y: 75 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Ch. SL 2018-114 | |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Veto Overridden |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Veto Received From House |
2018-06-27 | House | Veto Overridden |
2018-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2018 |
2018-06-25 | House | Received from the Governor |
2018-06-25 | Vetoed 06/25/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Ratified | |
2018-06-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2018-06-15 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2018 |
2018-06-14 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2018-06-14 | House | Conferees Changed |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Conferees Changed |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2018-06-12 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2018-06-12 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2018-06-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Ruled Material |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-16 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S501 (Same As) 2017-04-04 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate