NC H420 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Ch. SL 2011-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Ch. SL 2011-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Oak Island/Wheel Locks
Title
Oak Island/Wheel Locks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Ch. SL 2011-135 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-19 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-15 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Placed On Cal For 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-22 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Filed |