NC H450 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Ch. SL 2011-172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Ch. SL 2011-172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guilford County Commissioners Districts
Title
Guilford County Commissioners Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Ch. SL 2011-172 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-16 | Rec To Concur As Amended | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-13 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-03-24 | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Banking | |
2011-03-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-23 | Filed |