NC H460 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Official State Battleship

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Official State Battleship

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-27HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S545 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback