NC H477 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Ch. SL 2020-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Ch. SL 2020-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Four-Year Terms/Town of Bethel
Title
Four-Year Terms/Town of Bethel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Ch. SL 2020-38 | |
2020-06-25 | Ratified | |
2020-06-25 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-25 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2020 |
2020-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2020-06-24 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-06-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2019 |
2019-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019 |
2019-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S198 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate