NC H480 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
ABC Permits/Tax Compliance & Reports
Title
ABC Permits/Tax Compliance & Reports
Sponsors
Rep. James Boles [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. Yvonne Holley [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Bobbie Richardson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control |
2017-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Alcoholic Beverage Control |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed |