NC H482 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstatement of Sick Leave/School Emp'ees
Title
Reinstatement of Sick Leave/School Emp'ees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Ch. SL 2009-144 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed By Gov. 6/19/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2009 | |
2009-06-08 | Ratified | |
2009-06-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Serial referral to Appropriations is stricken. | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-09 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S740 (Same As) 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-113