NC H493 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Merge Cosmetology & Electrolysis Bds
Title
Merge Cosmetology & Electrolysis Bds
Sponsors
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] |
Rep. Cody Henson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed |