NC H563 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Ref To Com On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Foreign Trade Zone/Expand Def of Pub Corp

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreign Trade Zone/Expand Def of Pub Corp

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-24SenateRef To Com On Commerce
2013-06-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-06-24SenateRec From House
2013-06-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-06-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-06-19HousePlaced On Cal For 06/20/2013
2013-06-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-06-19HouseReptd Fav
2013-05-09HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2013-05-09HouseReptd Fav
2013-04-04HouseRef To Com On Commerce and Job Development
2013-04-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-03HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback