NC H597 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Ch. SL 2015-57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Ch. SL 2015-57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mediated Settlement Agreements
Title
Mediated Settlement Agreements
Sponsors
Sen. James Bishop [R] | Rep. Paul Stam [R] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Larry Hall [D] |
Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Ch. SL 2015-57 | |
2015-06-04 | Signed by Gov. 6/4/2015 | |
2015-05-29 | Pres. To Gov. 5/29/2015 | |
2015-05-28 | Ratified | |
2015-05-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2015-05-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/27/2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-05-21 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/20/2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2015 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-09 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |