NC H61 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-11)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Ref To Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reform Oversight of State-Owned Vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reform Oversight of State-Owned Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-28HouseRef To Com On Appropriations
2013-02-28HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2013-02-27HousePlaced On Cal For 02/28/2013
2013-02-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-02-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-02-05HouseRef To Com On Finance
2013-02-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-01-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S145 (Same As) 2013-02-28 - Ref To Com On Transportation

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback