NC H615 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - Ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - Ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Probation Violation Court Costs
Title
Probation Violation Court Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-06-10 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/09/2015 |
2015-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-05-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-09 | House | Filed |