NC H620 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Street Database/Manual/Public Record Except

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Street Database/Manual/Public Record Except

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
2019-07-11 Ratified
2019-07-10HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-10HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-09HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-09SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-08SenateEngrossed
2019-07-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-08SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-08HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S480 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback