NC H621 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
3-Year FDA Approval for New Childhood Vaxx
Title
3-Year FDA Approval for New Childhood Vaxx
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. Brian Biggs [R] | Rep. Larry Potts [R] | Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] |
Rep. Donnie Loftis [R] | Rep. Charles Miller [R] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] |
Rep. David Willis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2023-05-02 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Families, Children, and Aging Policy |
2023-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-17 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Commissions
Diseases & Health Disorders
Health Services
Minors
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Vaccines
Diseases & Health Disorders
Health Services
Minors
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Vaccines
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
130A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
130A | 152 | (n/a) | Citation Text |